Clark, Margaret Anne (CPSO#: 67146)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 08 Sep 1997

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 08 Sep 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 05 Aug 1993
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Aug 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 05 Sep 1993
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Sep 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Sep 1993
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 1993
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 08 Sep 1997