Clark, Robert Norman (CPSO#: 50258)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1981

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Oct 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
King Street Medical Arts Centre
71 King Street West
Suite 202
Mississauga ON  L5B 4A2
Phone: (905) 897-0305
Fax: (905) 897-0306
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Robert N. Clark Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 28 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Clark ( CPSO# 50258 )

Business Address:
King Street Medical Arts Centre
202 - 71 King Street West
Mississauga ON  L5B 4A2
Phone Number: (905) 897-0305

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Gastroenterology Effective: 30 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist
Internal Medicine Effective: 26 Jun 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERT NORMAN CLARK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CLARK is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Oct 1986