Clark, Roy Douglas (CPSO#: 12798)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1949

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 01 Jan 1961 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 1949
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Sep 1959
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jan 1961
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 03 May 1965
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2004