Clark, Russell Peter (CPSO#: 73141)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Nov 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Nov 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
955 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 5E1
Phone: (807) 343-8936
Fax: (807) 766-7226
Electoral District: 09
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Thunder Bay Regional Health
Sciences Centre
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 5E1
Canada
Phone: (807) 684-6000
Fax: (807) 684-6363
County: District of Thunder Bay
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Russell Peter Clark Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 08 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Clark ( CPSO# 73141 )

Business Address:
955 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 5E1
Phone Number: (807) 343-8936

Business Address:
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 5E1
Phone Number: (807) 684-6000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
McCausland Hospital Terrace Bay
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RUSSELL PETER CLARK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CLARK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 04 Jan 1999 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 31 Dec 1999
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Nov 1998