Clark, Sarah Andrea Rose (CPSO#: 86249)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Lakehead University Health Services
955 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 5E1
Phone: (807) 343-8361
Fax: (807) 346-7740
Electoral District: 09
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Thunder Bay District Health Unit
999 Balmoral Street
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6E7
Canada
Phone: (807) 625-5900
County: District of Thunder Bay
Electoral District: 09

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SARAH ANDREA ROSE CLARK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CLARK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2009