Clarke, Allison Janet (CPSO#: 80793)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Renfrew Victoria Hospital
510 Raglan Street North
Renfrew ON  K7V 1P5
Phone: (613) 433-5712
Fax: (613) 433-5727
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Clarke and Di Paolo Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 27 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Clarke ( CPSO# 80793 )
Dr. A. Di Paolo ( CPSO# 80794 )

Business Address:
Renfrew Victoria Hospital
510 Raglan Street North
Renfrew ON  K7V 1P5
Phone Number: (613) 433-9152

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Renfrew Victoria Hospital Renfrew

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Jun 2006 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALLISON JANET CLARKE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CLARKE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2006