Clarke, Christopher Robert Fredrick (CPSO#: 63819)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 1 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1992
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016