Clarke, Gillian Isabella (CPSO#: 68281)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 31 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Jul 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist
Dermatology Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Dermatology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Sep 2000
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 Jul 2003