Clarke, Hance Alex (CPSO#: 79400)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
Room 3EB 317
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-4800 Ext. 6649
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

2863 Ellesmere Rd Suite #110
Scarborough ON  M1E 4B9
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. H.A. Clarke Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 31 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Clarke ( CPSO# 79400 )

Business Address:
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
Eaton North, Room 3EB 317
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-4800

Business Address:
110 - 2863 Ellesmere Road
Toronto ON  M1E 4B9


Corporation Name: Clarke/Katznelson/Marinov Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 17 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Clarke ( CPSO# 79400 )
Dr. R. Katznelson ( CPSO# 78825 )
Dr. A. Marinov ( CPSO# 79687 )

Business Address:
110 - 2863 Ellesmere Road
Toronto ON  M1E 4B9

Business Address:
Toronto General Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
200 Elizabeth Street
Room 3 EB 317
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-4800

Business Address:
Toronto General Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
EN3 451-200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-4800

Business Address:
Toronto General Hospital
Ground Floor, Room 405
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-4800


Corporation Name: Drs. Clarke/Katznelson/Marinov Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 22 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Clarke ( CPSO# 79400 )
Dr. R. Katznelson ( CPSO# 78825 )
Dr. A. Marinov ( CPSO# 79687 )

Business Address:
Suite 110
2863 Ellesmere Road
Toronto ON  M1E 4B9
Phone Number: (416) 287-0990

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste Marie
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HANCE ALEX CLARKE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CLARKE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2008