Clarke, Howard Martyn (CPSO#: 30274)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Jul 1978

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Dec 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 5423
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-6444
Fax: (416) 813-6147
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Howard M. Clarke Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 16 2016

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Holland Bloorview Kids Rehabilitation Hospital Toronto
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 17 Nov 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HOWARD MARTYN CLARKE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CLARKE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jul 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Dec 1985