Clarke, Janet Helen (CPSO#: 65170)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Jul 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 305
1 Huron Street
Collingwood ON  L9Y 1C3
Phone: (705) 445-4111
Fax: (705) 445-8250
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Janet Clarke Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 24 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Clarke ( CPSO# 65170 )

Business Address:
Suite 305
1 Huron Street
Collingwood ON  L9Y 1C3
Phone Number: (705) 445-4111

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Collingwood General and Marine Hospital Collingwood

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1994 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JANET HELEN CLARKE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CLARKE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Other - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1993