Clarke, Leigh Langstroth (CPSO#: 24221)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Mar 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Mar 2011

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Hospital Privileges

No Privileges reported.

Hospital Notices

Source:  Hospital
Active Date:  May 27, 2009
Expiry Date:  
Summary:  
NOTICE OF SUSPENSION OF PRIVILEGES:

On June 30, 2009, Centre de sante communautaire du Temiskaming notified the College that Dr. Leigh Langstroth Clarke's privileges were suspended, effective May 27, 2009.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Mar 2011

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: April 19, 2012
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Dr. Clarke was subject to an investigation by the College on allegations that he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession. In the face of these allegations, Dr. Clarke resigned from the College and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario.


Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: March 1, 2011
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Effective March 1, 2011, Dr. Leigh Langstroth Clarke has resigned from the College.