Clarke, Michelle Bonnie (CPSO#: 62418)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jul 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
206-1436 Royal York Rd
Toronto ON  M9P 3A9
Phone: (416) 746-0689
Fax: (416) 746-8682
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHELLE BONNIE CLARKE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CLARKE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jul 1991