Clarke, Natasha Claudia Thalia (CPSO#: 72483)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Mar 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Healthpoint Medicine
Suite 204
490 Bramalea Road
Brampton ON  L6T 0G1
Phone: (905) 792-6500
Fax: (905) 792-6853
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Tall Pines L T C Centre
1001 Peter Robertson Boulevard
Brampton ON  L6R 2Y3
Canada
Phone: (905) 791-2449
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 14 Jun 2000 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NATASHA CLAUDIA THALIA CLARKE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CLARKE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Mar 2001