Clarke, Stephen Christopher (CPSO#: 59584)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Dec 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
c/o Homewood Health Centre
150 Delhi Street
Guelph ON  N1E 6K9
Phone: (519) 824-1010 Ext. 2263
Fax: (519) 767-3536
Electoral District: 03

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Homewood Health Centre Guelph

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 1990 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STEPHEN CHRISTOPHER CLARKE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CLARKE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Dec 1989