Clarke, Sylvia Maria (CPSO#: 64209)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 21 Jan 2002

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 21 Jan 2002

Summary

Former Name: Rees, Sylvia Maria (used until: 17 Dec 1998 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1991
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 23 Jul 1993
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Apr 1999
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 21 Jan 2002