Clarridge, Nicholas Edward Christopher (CPSO#: 99294)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Oct 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Sep 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University College, Cork, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mackenzie Health
10 Trench St.
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Phone: (905)883-1212
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nicholas Clarridge Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 15 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Clarridge ( CPSO# 99294 )

Business Address:
Mackenzie Health
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Phone Number: (905) 883-1212

Business Address:
Mount Sinai Hospital
Emergency Department
Suite 206
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone Number: (416) 586-8226

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Oct 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NICHOLAS EDWARD CHRISTOPHER CLARRIDGE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CLARRIDGE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 29 Oct 2012 to 20 Jan 2013
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 21 Jan 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 28 Oct 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 29 Oct 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 28 Oct 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 29 Oct 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 28 Oct 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 29 Oct 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Jan 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Sep 2015