Clarson, Cheril Linda (CPSO#: 52271)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Jun 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Nottingham, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Children's Hospital, London Health
Sciences Centre
800 Commissioner's Rd East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8138
Fax: (519) 685-8105
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Cheril Clarson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 05 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Clarson ( CPSO# 52271 )

Business Address:
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8138

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bluewater Health Sarnia
London Health Sciences Centre,Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 21 Nov 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHERIL LINDA CLARSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CLARSON is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Jan 1981
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1985