Clasky, Howard Jeffrey (CPSO#: 64086)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Apr 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Scarborough General Hospital
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5
Phone: (416) 438-2911 Ext. 3315
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Lakeridge Health Oshawa
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Canada
Phone: (905) 576-8711
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Howard Clasky Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 01 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Clasky ( CPSO# 64086 )

Business Address:
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Toronto ON  M1P 2V5

Business Address:
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone Number: (905) 576-8711


Corporation Name: H. Clasky Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 9 2007

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist
Emergency Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HOWARD JEFFREY CLASKY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CLASKY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 5 - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Resident 5 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Apr 1993