Claveau, Richard Lucien (CPSO#: 72403)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Dec 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Dec 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
PO Box 1570
1403 Edward Street
Hearst ON  P0L 1N0
Phone: (705) 362-7511
Fax: (705) 362-7161
Electoral District: 08
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

181 Algonquin Blvd W
Timmins ON  P4N 2R6
Canada
Phone: (705) 221-5326
County: Territorial District of Cochrane
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Societe Professionnelle De Medecine Richard Claveau

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 15 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Claveau ( CPSO# 72403 )

Business Address:
1403 Edward Street
P. O. Box 1570
Hearst ON  P0L 1N0
Phone Number: (705) 362-7511

Business Address:
1101 Front Street
Hearst ON  P0L 1N0
Phone Number: (705) 362-5739

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Geraldton District Hospital Geraldton
Notre-Dame Hospital Hearst
Sensenbrenner Hospital Kapuskasing

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 07 Dec 2000 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RICHARD LUCIEN CLAVEAU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CLAVEAU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 31 Jul 2000 to 19 Nov 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 19 Nov 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Dec 2000