Clay, Wendy Arlene (CPSO#: 21382)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2000

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Community Medicine Effective: 06 Dec 1982 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1967
Transfer of class of registration to: Armed Forces Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1968
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2000