Clayden, Wesley Curtis (CPSO#: 93812)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Moran Medical Centre
344 Hume Street
Collingwood ON  L9Y 1W3
Phone: (705) 445-9044
Fax: 7054458017
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Peak to Shore
Physiotherapy and Sports Medicine
1 First St, Unit 102
Collingwood ON  L9Y1A1
Canada
Phone: 7054462551
Fax: 7054461897
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05

Medical Records Location

Address: The Sports Medicine Specialists 5th Floor 150 Eglinton Avenue East Toronto, ON M4P 1E8
Date Received: 27 May 2015

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Collingwood General and Marine Hospital Collingwood

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WESLEY CURTIS CLAYDEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CLAYDEN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2012
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2016