Clein, Lawrence Joseph (CPSO#: 20739)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 05 Jul 1989

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of London, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective: 14 Mar 1966 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Apr 1967
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1967
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 27 Feb 1970
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 1985
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 05 Jul 1989