Clements, Duaine Arlene (CPSO#: 16340)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 30 Jun 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2006

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1957

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jul 1957
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2006
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2006
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Jun 2006

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 05 Jun 2006
Summary:

 On June 5, 2006, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Clements to have committed professional 
 misconduct that would be regarded by members to be disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.  
 The Committee ordered Dr. Clements to be reprimanded with the fact of the reprimand to be recorded 
 on the register.

Dr. Clements signed the following undertaking on June 1, 2006:

1.	I, Dr. Duaine 
 Clements, undertake to resign from the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, no later 
 than 11:59 p.m. on June 30, 2006.

2.	I, Dr. Duaine Clements, hereby undertake not to apply or 
 re-apply for registration as a physician or for a licence to practise medicine in any 
 jurisdiction.

3.	I, Dr. Duaine Clements, consent to the terms of this undertaking being entered 
 on the register as information that is available to the public.

4.	I, Dr. Duaine Clements, agree 
 that, in any event that the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario should become aware that 
 I have either applied, reapplied or attempted to apply or re-apply for registration as a physician 
 or for a licence to practice medicine in any jurisdiction, the College of Physicians and Surgeons 
 of Ontario shall, in its sole discretion, have the right to proceed with a disciplinary proceeding 
 on the basis of a breach of this undertaking.

5.	I, Dr. Duaine Clements, acknowledge that I have 
 obtained independent legal advice before giving this undertaking.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Jun 05, 2006