Clements, Karen Helen (CPSO#: 57985)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 May 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Freeport Hospital
3570 King St East
Kitchener ON  N2A 2W1
Phone: (519) 749-4300 Ext. 7448
Fax: 5198948326
Electoral District: 03
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

35 Harvard Rd
PO Box 21008
Guelph ON  N1G 3T4
Canada
Phone: (519) 362 3343
Fax: (519) 766 9405
County: County of Wellington
Electoral District: 03

629 King Road West
Burlington ON  L7T 3N8
Canada
Phone: (519) 362-3343
Fax: (519) 766-9405
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

700 Coronation Blvd
Cambridge Memorial Hospital
Cambridge ON  N1R 3G2
Canada
Phone: (519) 621-2330
Fax: (519) 740-4985
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03

88 Waterloo St
CMHC
Guelph ON  N1E 4J8
Canada
Phone: (519) 821-2060
Fax: (519) 821-7225
County: County of Wellington
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Karen Helen Clements Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 21 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Clements ( CPSO# 57985 )

Business Address:
Cambridge Memorial Hospital
Outpatient Mental Health
3rd Floor
700 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N1E 6T9
Phone Number: (519) 621-9180

Business Address:
35 Harvard Road
PO Box 21008
Guelph ON  N1G 3T4
Phone Number: (519) 362-3343

Business Address:
490 York Road
Building A Suite 107
Guelph ON  N1E 6T9
Phone Number: (519) 362-3343

Business Address:
Freeport Site - Grand River Hospital
Psychogeriatric Clinic
2nd Floor
56 Morrison Road
Kitchener ON  N2A 2W6
Phone Number: (519) 749-4300

Business Address:
Canadian Mental Health Clinic
88 Waterloo Street
Guelph ON  N1H 0A1
Phone Number: (519) 821-2060

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Freeport Site Kitchener
St Joseph's Health Centre,Guelph Guelph

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Aug 1989 CFPC Specialist
Psychiatry Effective: 17 Nov 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KAREN HELEN CLEMENTS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CLEMENTS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 15 Jun 1987 to 14 Jun 1988
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Mar 1989 to 30 Apr 1989
Elective Trainee - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Mar 1994
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 May 1989