Clemes, Ian Lindsay (CPSO#: 12850)

Current Status: Revoked: Discipline Committee as of 22 Jan 2001

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 22 Jan 2001

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1949

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 01 Jan 1956 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jul 1949
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 14 Jul 1999
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 14 Jul 1999
Revoked: Discipline Committee. Effective: 22 Jan 2001

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 22 Jan 2001
Summary:

 On January 22, 2001, the Discipline Committee accepted Dr. Clemes guilty plea and found him guilty 
 of allegations #3 and #4 of the Notice of Hearing in that he prescribed drugs for an improper 
 purpose.  The Discipline Committee also accepted Dr. Clemes guilty plea to allegations #5 and #6 
 of the Notice of Hearing in that he engaged in acts relevant to the practice of medicine that 
 having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, 
 dishonourable or unprofessional.

Further, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Clemes guilty of 
 professional misconduct with regard to allegations #1 and #2 of the Notice of Hearing in that he 
 sexually abused patients and engaged in sexual impropriety.  

The Committee found Dr. Clemes 
 guilty of incompetence.

Subsequently the Committee ordered:
(	revocation;
(	recorded 
 reprimand;
(	a requirement that Dr. Clemes reimburse the College for funding provided for the 
 patient under Section 85.7 of the Health Professions Procedural Code; and that,
(	Dr. Clemes pay 
 to the College costs in the amount of $10,000.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Jan 22, 2001