Clendenning, Christine Ruth (CPSO#: 64724)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jan 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Apr 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 4
204 6th Avenue
Lively ON  P3Y 1M4
Phone: (705) 692-4774
Fax: (705) 692-0528
Electoral District: 08

Medical Records Location

Address: Ontario Document Storage (ODS) PO Box 2071 Sudbury , Ontario P3A 4R8 Phone: (705) 560-8461 Fax: (705) 524-8012 Email: odstorage@persona.ca
Date Received: 05 Nov 2008

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury
St Joseph's Continuing Care Centre,Sudbury Sudbury

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTINE RUTH CLENDENNING may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CLENDENNING is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 1992 to 31 Dec 1992
Other - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 1993 to 31 Dec 1993
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Apr 1993