Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Clendenning, Robert Douglas (CPSO#: 62090)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 May 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 May 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Medical Associates of Port Perry
462 Paxton Street
Port Perry ON  L1L 1L9
Phone: (905) 985-2895
Fax: (844) 840-3229
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Robert Clendenning Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 27 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Clendenning ( CPSO# 62090 )

Business Address:
462 Paxton Street
Port Perry ON  L9L 1L9
Phone Number: (905) 985-2895

Medical Records Location

Address: Ontario Document Storage (ODS) PO Box 2071 Sudbury , Ontario P3A 4R8 Phone: (705) 560-8461 Fax: (705) 524-8012 Email: odstorage@persona.ca
Date Received: 05 Aug 2010


Address: Ontario Document Storage (ODS) PO Box 2071 Sudbury , Ontario P3A 4R8 Phone: (705) 560-8461 Fax: (705) 524-8012 Email: odstorage@persona.ca
Date Received: 08 Jan 2009

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health Scugog Port Perry Site Port Perry

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 1990 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 05 Dec 1995 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERT DOUGLAS CLENDENNING may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CLENDENNING is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 May 1990