Clerk, Nilam Anil (CPSO#: 31159)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Dec 1972

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Oct 1979

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Bombay, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
MackenzieHealth Richmond Hill Hospi
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Phone: (905) 883-1212 Ext. 7028
Fax: (905) 883-2160
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nilam Clerk Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 28 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Clerk ( CPSO# 31159 )

Business Address:
York Central Hospital - Main Hospital Site
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Phone Number: (905) 883-1212

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Pathology Effective: 05 Apr 1977 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NILAM ANIL CLERK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CLERK is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Dec 1972
Transfer of class of registration to: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Feb 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 1979