Clermont, Dawn Cindy (CPSO#: 65663)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Jul 1993

Summary

Former Name: Poulin, Dawn Cindy (used until: 03 Jul 1994 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McMaster University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Orchard View By The Mississipi
219 Paterson Street
Almonte ON  K0A 1A0
Phone: (613) 963-5000
Electoral District: 07

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAWN CINDY CLERMONT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CLERMONT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1993