Clevette, Nancy Anne (CPSO#: 62318)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Aug 1991

Summary

Former Name: Clevette-Radford, Nancy Anne (used until: 09 Jun 1999 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 8
5303 Canotek Road
Ottawa ON  K1J 9M1
Phone: (613) 746-6223
Fax: (613) 746-6018
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Unit 300
5307 Canotek Road
Ottawa ON  K1J 9M2
Canada
Phone: (613) 746-6223
Fax: 6137466018
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. N.A. Clevette Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 21 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Clevette ( CPSO# 62318 )

Business Address:
Unit 8
5303 Canotek Road
Ottawa ON  K1J 9M1
Phone Number: (613) 746-6223

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1992 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NANCY ANNE CLEVETTE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CLEVETTE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 15 Jun 1990 to 14 Jun 1991
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Aug 1991