Climans, Troy Harris (CPSO#: 100589)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 01 Jul 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
Department of Hematology
Room L 208, Luke Wing
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N4A6
Phone: 905-522-1155 Ext. 33187
Electoral District: 04

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TROY HARRIS CLIMANS shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. CLIMANS is enrolled at MCMASTER UNIVERSITY;

(2) Dr. CLIMANS shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. CLIMANS is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. CLIMANS shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. CLIMANS is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. CLIMANS no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018