Climie, Robert Charles Donald (CPSO#: 23856)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 162 Pilgrim Ln Delta ON K0E 1G0
Date Received: 25 May 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Community Medicine Effective: 04 Dec 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Community Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017