Clivatti, Jefferson (CPSO#: 96040)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2014

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 23 Sep 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Universidade Federal de Sao Paulo, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Postgraduate Medical Education
University of Toronto
500 University Avenue, Suite 602
Toronto ON  M5G 1V7
Phone: 4169786976
Electoral District: 10

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JEFFERSON CLIVATTI shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. CLIVATTI is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO;

(2) Dr. CLIVATTI shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. CLIVATTI is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. CLIVATTI shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. CLIVATTI is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. CLIVATTI no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 10 Aug 2011
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 11 Aug 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 22 Sep 2014
Assessment Verification Period - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Aug 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2014
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018