Clive, Barbara Agnes (CPSO#: 50265)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1981

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Aug 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Trillium Health Partners
Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Ave West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone: (905) 813-1100 Ext. 5415
Fax: (905) 813-4229
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Barbara A. Clive Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 29 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Clive ( CPSO# 50265 )

Business Address:
Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Geriatric Medicine 1F518
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone Number: (905) 813-1100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 1985 RCPSC Specialist
Geriatric Medicine Effective: 05 Dec 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BARBARA AGNES CLIVE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CLIVE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Aug 1985