Clive, Peter John (CPSO#: 55916)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 27 May 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1985
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 17 Aug 1987
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Mar 1996
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2009