Cloete, Nicolaas Gert Francois (CPSO#: 78675)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Nov 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 25 Jun 2016

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Afrikaans, English

Education:University of Pretoria, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Grand River Medical Centre
55 Argyle Street North
Caledonia ON  N3W 1B8
Phone: (905) 765-4061
Fax: (605) 765-0584
Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
West Haldimand,General Hospital Hagersville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 03 Dec 2003 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Cardiac Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 17 Nov 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Cardiac Surgery

McMaster University, 18 Nov 2003 to 17 Nov 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Cardiac Surgery

McMaster University, 18 Nov 2004 to 17 Nov 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Cardiac Surgery

McMaster University, 18 Nov 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiac Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 31 Dec 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2007 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Nov 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Mar 2004
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Inquiries, Complaints and Repo Effective: 09 Aug 2016

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee Effective: 09 Aug 2016 Active View Details [+]
            As from June 25, 2016, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Nicolaas Gert
            Francois Cloete, in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr.
            Cloete to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                        UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
                                          ("Undertaking")
                  
                                                of
                  
                              DR. NICOLAAS GERT FRANCOIS CLOETE
                                          ("Dr. Cloete")
                  
                                                to 
                  
                        COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                          (the "College")
                  
            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "ICR Committee" means the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of
                  the College;
                  
                  "NMS" means the Drug Program Services Branch, the Narcotics Monitoring
                  System implemented under the Narcotics Safety and Awareness Act, 2010;

                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Cloete, certificate of registration number 78675, am a member of
                  the College.

            (3)   I, Dr. Cloete, acknowledge that I am subject to a specified continuing
                  education and remediation program as required by the ICR Committee in its
                  Decision dated July 25, 2012 (the "SCERP Order"), a copy of which is
                  attached hereto as Appendix "A".

            (4)   I, Dr. Cloete, acknowledge that pursuant to paragraph C.4. of the SCERP
                  Order, the ICR Committee directed that I undergo two reassessments of my
                  clinical practice by a College-appointed Assessor.  I further acknowledge
                  that pursuant to paragraph C.4 of the SCERP Order, an Assessor conducted
                  a reassessment of my practice and provided reports to the College dated
                  September 26, 2015 and December 16, 2015 (the "Assessor's Reports").
            (5)   I, Dr. Cloete, acknowledge that the terms of the SCERP Order remain in
                  effect and that this includes the requirement that I undergo a second
                  reassessment of my clinical practice by a College-appointed Assessor.

            (6)   I, Dr. Cloete, acknowledge that the Assessor's Reports were considered by
                  the ICR Committee on May 18, 2016, and that the ICR Committee has
                  directed a term of further supervision.

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (7)   I, Dr. Cloete, acknowledge and agree that I am bound by this Undertaking
                  from the date on which I sign it.

            (8)   Clinical Supervision 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Cloete, undertake to practise under the guidance of a
                        clinical supervisor(s) acceptable to the College (the "Clinical
                        Supervisor(s)"), for six (6) months ("Clinical Supervision"). 
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Cloete, acknowledge that I have reviewed the Clinical
                        Supervisor(s)'s undertaking, attached hereto as Appendix "B", and
                        understand what is required of the Clinical Supervisor(s). The
                        Clinical Supervisor(s) will, at minimum: 
                  
                        (i)   Meet with me once every month;
                  
                        (ii)  Review at least fifteen (15) of my patient charts every
                              month;
                  
                        (iii) Discuss any concerns arising from the chart reviews;
                  
                        (iv)  Make recommendations to me for practice improvements and
                              ongoing professional development and inquire into my
                              compliance with the recommendations; 
                  
                        (v)   Perform any other duties, such as reviewing other documents
                              or conducting interviews with staff or colleagues, that the
                              Clinical Supervisor(s) deem necessary to my Clinical
                              Supervision; and
                  
                        (vi)  Submit written reports to the College at least once every
                              month, or more frequently if the Clinical Supervisor(s) has
                              concerns about my standard of practice.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Cloete, acknowledge that the charts reviewed shall be
                        selected by the Clinical Supervisor(s) based on the areas of
                        concern identified in the reports of the Preceptor, dated January
                        15, 2014 and April 15, 2014 (the "Preceptor's Reports"), and  the
                        Assessor's Reports, and concerns that may arise during the period
                        of Clinical Supervision.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Cloete, undertake to cooperate fully with the Clinical
                        Supervision of my practice, conducted under the term of this
                        Undertaking and Appendix "B" attached, and to abide by the
                        recommendations of my Clinical Supervisor(s), including but not
                        limited to, any recommended practice improvements and ongoing
                        professional development.
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Cloete, undertake to ensure that Appendix "B" to this
                        Undertaking, is signed and delivered to the College within thirty
                        (30) days of the date I execute this Undertaking.
                  
                  (f)   I, Dr. Cloete, undertake that if a person who has given an
                        undertaking in Appendix "B" to this Undertaking is unable or
                        unwilling to continue to fulfill its provisions, I shall, within
                        twenty (20) days of receiving notice of same, obtain an executed
                        undertaking in the same form from a similarly qualified person who
                        is acceptable to the College and ensure that it is delivered to the
                        College within that time.
                  
                  (g)   I, Dr. Cloete, agree that if I am unable to obtain a Clinical
                        Supervisor on the provisions set out under sections (8)(e) and/or
                        (f) above, I will cease practising medicine until such time as I
                        have obtained a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College.  
                  
                  (h)   I, Dr. Cloete, agree that if I am required to cease practise as a
                        result of section (8)(g) above this will constitute a term,
                        condition or limitation on my certificate of registration and that
                        term, condition or limitation will be included on the public
                        register.
                  
            (9)   Reassessment of Practice

                  (a)   I, Dr. Cloete, undertake that, approximately three (3) months after
                        the completion of the Clinical Supervision set out in section (8)
                        above and Appendix "B" attached, I will submit to a Reassessment of
                        my practice ("the Reassessment") by an assessor or assessors
                        selected by the College (the "Assessor(s)").  I acknowledge and
                        agree that the Reassessment may include a chart review, direct
                        observation of my care, interviews with colleagues and co-workers,
                        feedback from patients and any other tools deemed necessary by the
                        College.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Cloete, undertake to co-operate fully with the Reassessment,
                        conducted under the term of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Cloete, acknowledge and agree that my Clinical Supervisor(s)
                        may receive and review the findings of the Assessor(s), and may
                        discuss with the Assessor(s) any issues or concerns arising from
                        the Reassessment.  I also acknowledge that the results of the
                        Reassessment will be provided to me and reported to the College and
                        the report may form the basis of further action by the College. 
                  
            (10)  Monitoring 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Cloete, undertake to inform the College of each and every
                        location that I practise or have privileges, including, but not
                        limited to, hospital(s), clinic(s) and office(s), in any
                        jurisdiction (collectively my "Practice Location(s)"), within
                        fifteen (15) days of executing this Undertaking.  Going forward, I
                        further undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice
                        Locations within fifteen (15) days of commencing practice at that
                        location.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Cloete, undertake and agree that I will submit to, and not
                        interfere with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Location(s)
                        and patient records by a College representative for the purposes of
                        monitoring my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Cloete, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                        appropriate enquiries of OHIP, NMS and/or any person who or
                        institution that may have relevant information, in order for the
                        College to monitor my compliance with the provisions of this
                        Undertaking. 
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Cloete, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP and NMS
                        consent forms, attached hereto as Appendix "C" and Appendix "D",
                        respectively. 
                  
            (11)  I, Dr. Cloete, undertake to comply with this Undertaking and acknowledge
                  that a breach by me of any provision of this Undertaking may constitute
                  an act of professional misconduct and/or incompetence, and may result in
                  a referral of specified allegations to the Discipline Committee of the
                  College.

            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (12)  I, Dr. Cloete, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to
                  in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (13)  I, Dr. Cloete, acknowledge that I shall be solely responsible for payment
                  of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the
                  implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking. 

            (14)  I, Dr. Cloete, acknowledge and confirm that I have read and understand
                  the provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent
                  legal counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived
                  my right to do so.

            (15)  I, Dr. Cloete, acknowledge that this entire Undertaking constitutes
                  terms, conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for
                  the purposes of section 23 of the Code. I understand that this
                  Undertaking shall be information on the College's Register that is
                  available to the public during the time period that the Undertaking
                  remains in effect.

            (16)  I, Dr. Cloete, acknowledge that the following summary will appear on the
                  College's Register that is available to the public during the time period
                  that this Undertaking remains in effect:

                        Dr. Cloete was the subject of a College investigation into his
                        standard of practice.  As a result of the investigation:
                  
                  *     Dr. Cloete will practise under the guidance of a Clinical
                        Supervisor acceptable to the College for six (6) months; and
                  
                  *     Dr. Cloete's practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by
                        the College within three (3) months of the end of the period of
                        Clinical Supervision.
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (17)  I, Dr. Cloete, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the
                  following information to all Clinical Supervisors, and/or Assessors:

                  (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                        entering into this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment
                        of, my practice; and 
                  
                  (c)   any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with
                        this Undertaking.
                  
            (18)  I, Dr. Cloete, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide this
                  Undertaking to any Chief(s) of Staff, or a colleague with similar
                  responsibilities approved by the College, at any Practice Location
                  ("Chief(s) of Staff"), and to provide said Chief(s) of Staff with any
                  information the College has that led to the circumstances of my entering
                  into this Undertaking and/or any information arising from the monitoring
                  of my compliance with this Undertaking.

            (19)  I, Dr. Cloete, give my irrevocable consent to all Clinical Supervisors,
                  Chiefs of Staff and Assessors, to disclose to the College, and to one
                  another, any information:

                  (a)   relevant to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   relevant to the provisions of the Clinical Supervisor's undertaking
                        set out at Appendix "B";
                  
                  (c)   relevant to the Reassessment;
                  
                  (d)   relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this
                        Undertaking; and/or  
                  
                  (e)   which comes to his or her attention and which he or she reasonably
                        believes indicates a potential risk of harm to my patients.

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: June 25, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Dr. Cloete was the subject of a College investigation into his standard of practice. As a result of the investigation:

- Dr. Cloete will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for six (6) months; and

- Dr. Cloete's practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College within three (3) months of the end of the period of Clinical Supervision.