Clottey, Clarence Edwin (CPSO#: 87620)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Sep 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 18 Aug 2016

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Akan, English, French, Ga, Portuguese

Education:Univ of Ghana, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Bristol Family Physicians
Suite 102
2315 Bristol Circle
Oakville ON  L6H 6P8
Phone: (905) 287-2035
Fax: (905) 287-2036
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Clarence Clottey Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 07 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Clottey ( CPSO# 87620 )

Business Address:
Bristol Family Physicians
102 - 2315 Bristol Circle
Oakville ON  L6J 6P8
Phone Number: (905) 287-2035

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Dec 2009 CFPC Specialist
Public Health and Preventive Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 04 Sep 2007 to 26 Nov 2007
Assessment Verification Period - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 27 Nov 2007 to 03 Sep 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 04 Sep 2008 to 03 Sep 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 04 Sep 2009 to 03 Sep 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 04 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 08 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Community Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 04 Sep 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Nov 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jan 2010
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 18 Aug 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Inquiries, Complaints and Repo Effective: 14 Apr 2017

Pending Hearings

Summary: Allegations of Dr. Clottey’s professional misconduct were referred to the Discipline Committee of the College. It is alleged that Dr. Clottey engaged in the sexual abuse of three (3) female patients and committed acts relevant to the practise of medicine, that, having regard to all the circumstances, would be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct.

Notice of Hearing: Download Full Notice (PDF)

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee Effective: 14 Apr 2017 Active View Details [+]
            As from 12:01 a.m., April 14, 2017, by order of the Inquiries, Complaints and
            Reports Committee of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, the
            following terms, conditions and limitations are imposed on the certificate of
            registration held by Dr. Clarence Edwin Clottey:

            Practice Restriction 

            (i)   Dr. Clottey shall not perform any examination of the breast, pelvic, or
                  rectal area of any female patient; 

            (ii)  Dr. Clottey shall provide a referral to another physician for any female
                  patient who seeks and/or may in his judgment require an examination of
                  the breast, pelvic, or rectal area; 

            Practice Monitor and Patient Log

            (iii) Dr. Clottey shall not engage in any professional encounters with female
                  patients of any age unless the patient encounter takes place in the
                  presence of a monitor who is a female member of a regulated health
                  profession who is acceptable to the College (the "Practice Monitor");

            (iv)  At all times, Dr. Clottey shall ensure that the Practice Monitor shall:

                  a.    Remain in the examination room or consultation room at all times
                        during all professional encounters with all female patients, even
                        if another person is accompanying the patient;
                  
                  b.    Carefully observe all of his physical examinations of all female
                        patients, with an unobstructed view of the examination;
                  
                  c.    Refrain from performing any other functions, except those required
                        in the Practice Monitor's undertaking attached as Appendix "A",
                        while observing him in all professional encounters with female
                        patients;
                  
                  d.    Keep a patient log in the form attached as Appendix "B" to this
                        Order of all the female patients with whom Dr. Clottey has an
                        in-person professional encounter in the Practice Monitor's presence
                        (the "Log");
                  
                  e.    Initial the corresponding entry in the records of each patient
                        noted in the Log to confirm that the Practice Monitor was in the
                        presence of Dr. Clottey at all times during each female in-person
                        professional encounter;
                  
                  f.    Submit the original Log to the College on a monthly basis; and
                  
                  g.    Provide reports (as described in the Practice Monitor's
                        Undertaking) to the College on at least a monthly basis.
                  
                  
            (v)   Dr. Clottey shall maintain a copy of the Log at all times, and shall make
                  it available to the College upon request;

            Notification of Practice Locations

            (vi)  Dr. Clottey shall inform the College of each and every location where he
                  practices including, but not limited to, hospital(s), clinic(s) and
                  office(s), in any jurisdiction (collectively the "Practice Location(s)"),
                  within five (5) days of this Order.  Going forward, he shall inform the
                  College of any and all new Practice Locations within five (5) days of
                  commencing practice at that location;

            Notification of Patients

            (vii) Dr. Clottey shall post a sign in his waiting room(s) and each of his
                  examination and/or consulting rooms, in all of his Practice Locations, in
                  a clearly visible and secure location, in the form attached hereto as
                  Appendix "C";

            (viii)Dr. Clottey shall post a certified translation(s) in any language(s) in
                  which he provides services, of the sign described in (vii) above, in his
                  waiting room(s) and each of his examination and/or consulting rooms, in
                  all of his Practice Locations, in a clearly visible and secure location;

            (ix)  Dr. Clottey shall provide the certified translation(s) described in
                  (viii) above within 30 days of the date of this Order;

            (x)   Dr. Clottey shall ensure that each patient who is scheduled for an
                  appointment with him is directly notified prior to the appointment, of
                  the details of the restrictions at (i) and (iii) above;  

            Monitoring

            (xi)  Dr. Clottey shall consent to the College to make appropriate enquiries of
                  the Ontario Health Insurance Plan and/or any person or institution who
                  may have relevant information in order for the College to monitor Dr.
                  Clottey's compliance with the terms of this Order and shall promptly sign
                  such consents as may be necessary for the College to obtain information
                  from these persons or institutions;

            (xii) Dr. Clottey shall submit to, and not interfere with, unannounced
                  inspections of his Practice Locations and to inspections of patient
                  charts by the College and to any other activity the College deems
                  necessary in order to monitor Dr. Clottey's compliance with the terms of
                  this Order;

            (xiii)Dr. Clottey shall consent to the College providing the Order to any
                  Chief(s) of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at any
                  Practice Location where he practices or has privileges ("Chief(s) of
                  Staff"), and to provide said Chief(s) of Staff with any information the
                  College has that led to this Order and/or any information arising from
                  the monitoring of his compliance with this Order.

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: August 16, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Criminal Charges:

Effective May 29, 2015,Where a member has been charged with an offence under the Criminal Code of Canada or the Ontario Health Insurance Act and the charge is outstanding and is known to the College, the College By-laws require certain information about the charge to be posted on the register.

The following are outstanding charges against this member, as known to the College, together with the corresponding information:

It is alleged that Clarence Clottey:

(1) on or about June 27, 2016, at the Town of Oakville did commit a sexual assault on XX, contrary to section 271 of the Criminal Code; and
(2) on or about December 15, 2012, at the Town of Oakville did commit a sexual assault on YY, contrary to section 271 of the Criminal Code.

Date of charges: August 16, 2016
Place of charges: Oakville, Ontario
Halton Regional Police Service


Source: Member
Active Date: August 16, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Bail Conditions:

Effective December 4, 2014, the College By-laws require members to report to the College any currently existing conditions of release (“bail conditions”) following a charge for a criminal or provincial offence or subsequent to a finding of guilt and pending appeal. The following are conditions of release made against this member that relate to this member’s practice of medicine:

[August 16, 2016]
Dr. Clottey is not to conduct any physical examinations on female patients except or unless in the presence of a College of Physicians and Surgeons approved chaperone, who is a regulated health professional.

Within 24 hours of Dr. Clottey’s release, he is to post in a visible area of the waiting room and in each examination room, at Bristol Family Physicians located at 102-2315 Bristol Circle, Oakville, ON, stating his name and notification that he will not perform physical examinations on female patients unless in the presence of a chaperone, who is a regulated health care professional approved of by the College of Physicians and Surgeons