Clouatre, Elsa (CPSO#: 100772)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Apr 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Humber River Regional Hospital
Emergency Department
1235 Wilson Ave.
Toronto ON  M3M0B2
Phone: 4162421000 Ext. 42318
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

St. Joseph's Health Centre
Emergency Deptarment
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Canada
Phone: 416-530-6000 Ext. 4549
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Elsa Clouatre Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 16 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Clouatre ( CPSO# 100772)

Business Address:
Humber River Regional Hospital
Emergency Department
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Phone Number: (416) 242-1000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ELSA CLOUATRE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CLOUATRE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Apr 2016