Clouthier, Justin (CPSO#: 84574)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 202
270 Charlotte Street
Peterborough ON  K9J 7H8
Phone: (705) 743-6760
Fax: (705) 743-9912
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Justin Clouthier Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 11 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Clouthier ( CPSO# 84574 )

Business Address:
Suite 202
270 Charlotte Street
Peterborough ON  K9J 7H8
Phone Number: (705) 743-6760

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Vascular Surgery Effective: 11 Oct 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JUSTIN CLOUTHIER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CLOUTHIER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 6 - Vascular Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 7 - Vascular Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2011