Cloutier, Martin (CPSO#: 78693)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Dec 2003

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Dec 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Sherbrooke, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Dec 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Dec 2003
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Dec 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Dec 2003