Cloutier, Stephanie (CPSO#: 77085)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 16 Apr 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 16 Apr 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: French

Education:Laval University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 25 Sep 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Oct 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 31 Aug 2003
Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Sep 2002
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 16 Apr 2004