Clow, David John (CPSO#: 52514)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Oct 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Oct 1987

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1880 Eglinton Ave E
unit 121
Scarborough ON  M1L 2L1
Phone: 4167011222
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

23546 Woodbine Ave
Block E
Keswick ON  L4P 3E9
Canada
Phone: 905 989 0911
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

2050 Weston Road
unit 108
York ON  M9N 3M4
Canada
Phone: 416 231 6517
County: Regional Municipality of Haldimand-Norfolk
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. David Clow Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 14 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Clow ( CPSO# 52514 )

Business Address:
Lower Level
589 Lake Street
St Catharines ON  L2N 7L6
Phone Number: (905) 937-2255

Business Address:
Suite 600
123 Edwards Street
Toronto ON  M5R 1E2
Phone Number: (416) 597-1016

Business Address:
Suite 410
340 College Street
Toronto ON  M5R 3A9
Phone Number: (416) 962-3202

Business Address:
1371 Neilson Road
Suite 309
Scarborough ON  M1B 4Z8

Business Address:
1880 Eglinton Avenue
Scarborough ON  M1L 2L1
Phone Number: (416) 701-1222

Hospital Privileges

No Privileges reported.

Hospital Notices

Source:  Hospital
Active Date:  March 31, 2009
Expiry Date:  
Summary:  
NOTICE OF RESTRICTIONS OF PRIVILEGES:

On May 11, 2009, Queensway Carleton Hospital notified the College that Dr. David John Clow’s privileges were restricted effective March 31, 2009, and further restricted effective April 1, 2009.

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 22 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID JOHN CLOW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CLOW is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1983 to 11 Jun 1984
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 31 Dec 1988
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 12 Jan 2010 to 01 Nov 2010
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1983
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Jun 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Oct 1987