Clowater, Julie Lee (CPSO#: 86893)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Dec 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Dec 2016

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 306
40 Centre Street
Chatham ON  N7M 5W3
Phone: (519) 352-7279
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J.L. Clowater Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 7 2011

Hospital Privileges

No Privileges reported.

Hospital Notices

Source:  Hospital
Active Date:  September 27, 2011
Expiry Date:  
Summary:  
On September 30, 2011, Chatham-Kent Health Alliance notified the College that Dr. Julie Lee Clowater's privileges were suspended, effective September 27, 2011.

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 03 Nov 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JULIE LEE CLOWATER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CLOWATER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 2007
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 07 Sep 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Oct 2011
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 22 Jul 2016
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 22 Jul 2016
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 01 Sep 2016
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 01 Dec 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Dec 2016

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 19 May 2016
Summary:

On May 19, 2016, the Discipline Committee of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of 
Ontario found that Dr. Julie Lee Clowater has committed an act of professional misconduct in 
that she has engaged in conduct or an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, 
having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as 
disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional. 

PRACTISING WITH SUSPENDED CERTIFICATE 

The certificate of registration of Dr. Clowater, a pediatrician with a community-based practice in 
Chatham, was suspended between September 7 and October 6, 2011 because of non-payment 
of fees. Despite being notified of this suspension, Dr. Clowater continued to practise during this 
time. 

On September 7, 2011, the College sent Dr. Clowater a Notice of Suspension of Certificate of 
Registration advising her that her certificate of registration was suspended for non-payment of 
fees. The Notice stated that if Dr. Clowater wished to resume practice in Ontario, she would 
have to apply to the College for reinstatement. The Notice also advised her that, if she were to 
reapply, her reinstatement would not be automatic; rather, it would take time to review and 
process her reinstatement application. Lastly, this September 7, 2011 Notice instructed Dr. 
Clowater not to resume practice until the College had advised her that her certificate had been 
issued. 

The College received Dr. Clowater’s reinstatement application fee on September 19, 2011. 
College staff emailed Dr. Clowater on September 28, 2011 to advise that her application was 
incomplete and that she therefore was not authorized to practice medicine. The College staff 
member asked Dr. Clowater to confirm whether she had practiced medicine after September 7, 
2011.  

Dr. Clowater emailed the College staff member back on September 28, 2011, saying, “I have 
not been practicing since september (sic.) 7th 2011. I am awaiting your email to resume 
practice.”  

Dr. Clowater later acknowledged that the statement that she had not practiced since September 
7, 2011 was untrue.  

LAPSE IN PROFESSIONAL LIABILITY COVERAGE 

Dr. Clowater practised medicine without professional liability coverage between November 1, 
2010 and June 17, 2011. She submitted claims to OHIP for the period during which she did not 
have coverage. 

In response to a College inquiry regarding her lapse in professional liability coverage, Dr. 
Clowater claimed that she first became aware that there had been a period of time during which 
her professional liability membership had not been in good stead after she received the 
College’s October 2013 letter. This was not true.  

PENALTY AND COSTS 

On July 22, 2016, the Committee ordered and directed that:  
                                   2 
              

-  Dr.  Clowater  appear before  the  Committee  to  be  reprimanded  and  the  fact  of  the 
   reprimand shall be recorded on the Register; 

-  The  Registrar  suspend  Dr.  Clowater’s  certificate  of  registration  for  a  period  of  three 
   months, to commence on September 1, 2016; 

-  The  Registrar  impose  the  following  term,  condition  and  limitations  on  Dr.  Clowater’s 
   certificate  of  registration:  Dr.  Clowater  shall  complete  a  course  in  medical  ethics 
   approved by the College within six months of release of this decision and shall provide 
   evidence of completion of this course to the College; and 

-  Dr. Clowater shall pay to the College costs in the amount of $5,000.00 within 60 days of 
   the date of this Order.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): May 19, 2016

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: November 23, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College By-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the
disposition includes a SCERP:
Download Full Document (PDF)