Cluett, Helen Curry (CPSO#: 58499)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jan 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
SandBanks Medical Centre
12 Prince Edward Drive
Wellington ON  K0K 3L0
Phone: (613) 399-1281 Ext. 3
Fax: (613) 399-2464
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Helen Curry Cluett Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 30 2017

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Quinte Healthcare Prince Edward Site Picton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Aug 1989 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HELEN CURRY CLUETT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CLUETT is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1987 to 14 Jun 1988
Other - Comprehensive Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jan 1989