Cluett, Marina Joy (CPSO#: 75418)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 15 Aug 2001

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 15 Aug 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 28 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 31 Dec 2000
Clinical Fellow - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2000
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 15 Aug 2001