Co, Thanh Ngoc Claudia (CPSO#: 66151)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 16 Apr 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 16 Apr 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Vietnamese

Education:University of Sherbrooke, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 09 Nov 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 31 Dec 1994
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Dec 1992
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 16 Apr 2007