Coakley, Annalee (CPSO#: 76354)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 18 Jun 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 18 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 11 Jun 2003 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2003
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 18 Jun 2005