Coates, Allan Lloyd (CPSO#: 54313)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Instructions: Records are with the institutions Dr. Coates saw the patients at. Home ventilation patients were transferred to Dr. Theo Moraes. Cystic fibrosis patients in Toronto was transferred to Dr. Felix Ratjen, and in Thunder Bay to Dr. Melinda Solomon.
Date Received: 15 Jun 2012

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 14 Nov 1977 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1984
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 May 1985
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Nov 1996
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2012