Coates, Charles Franklin (CPSO#: 19333)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 14 Aug 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 14 Aug 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1961

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 16 Nov 1970 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1961
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Jun 1962
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Oct 1964
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 14 Aug 2014